Twiddy, Matthew Ronald (CPSO#: 95507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
60 Riverside Drive
Charlottetown PE  C1A8T5
Phone: 9026200409
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew Twiddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 23 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW RONALD TWIDDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TWIDDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2014