Tyan, Chung Chun (CPSO#: 91893)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Queensland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1) 800 Danforth Rd Scarborough, ON M1K 1H8 2) 294 Main St Suite 301 Toronto, ON M4C 4X5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017