Tyler, Kevin Michael (CPSO#: 88644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
75 Charles St.
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone: (613) 345-5649
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. M. Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tyler ( CPSO# 88644 )
Dr. M. Tyler ( CPSO# 89038 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5649

Business Address:
102 - 135 Ormond Street
Brockville ON  K6V 5Y2
Phone Number: (613) 342-2409

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site Durham
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN MICHAEL TYLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2014