Tyrrell, Rachel Ruth (CPSO#: 96877)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-3745
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek J. Tyrrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018


Corporation Name: Dr. Rachel R. Tyrrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tyrrell ( CPSO# 96877 )

Business Address:
Elliot Street Clinic
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone Number: (613) 267-8278

Business Address:
33 Drummond Street West
Perth ON  K7H 2K1
Phone Number: (613) 267-1500

Business Address:
455 McNeely Avenue
Carleton Place ON  K7C 4S6
Phone Number: (613) 253-2233

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL RUTH TYRRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYRRELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013