Tzakas, Peter (CPSO#: 89905)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1871 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 699-7775
Fax: (416) 699-7766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Tzakas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tzakas ( CPSO# 89905 )

Business Address:
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 699-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER TZAKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TZAKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2010