Tzemos, Nikolaos (CPSO#: 83573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Feb 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jan 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Feb 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek, Italian

Education:University of Milan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of Cardiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3038
Fax: (519) 434-3278
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 01 Feb 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 14 Oct 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jan 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Nikolaos Tzemos may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of   Cardiology,  the  University  of Western Ontario, in
                        which Dr. Tzemos holds an academic appointment  at the rank of Full
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when  Dr. Tzemos no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


            Note: This  certificate  is  issued on February 1, 2017, and currently  has  an
                  interim  expiry date of January  30,  2020.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraph 2.