Tzerovska, Rayka Ivanova (CPSO#: 80714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Russian, Serbian

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Division
Department of Anaethesia
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3312
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Taunton Health Centre,
1300 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 723-8551
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tzerovska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 24 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYKA IVANOVA TZEROVSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TZEROVSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 26 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010