Uchino, Minako (CPSO#: 92330)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Tokyo Women's Medical University (TWMU), 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 17 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012