Uddin, Fatima (CPSO#: 88947)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regent Park Community Health Centre
465 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2B2
Phone: (416) 364-2261
Fax: (416) 364-0822
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Anishnawbe Health Toronto
225 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1S4
Canada
Phone: (416) 360-0486
Fax: (416) 365-1083
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fatima Uddin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Uddin ( CPSO# 88947 )

Business Address:
225 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1S4
Phone Number: (416) 360-0486

Business Address:
Regent Park Community Health Centre
465 Dundas Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 2B2
Phone Number: (416) 364-2261

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FATIMA UDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDDIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010