Udell, Jacob Allan (CPSO#: 80505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7723
Fax: (416) 323-6304
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Udell and Kuriya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Udell ( CPSO# 80505 )
Dr. B. Kuriya ( CPSO# 79433 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-7723

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
2nd Floor
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACOB ALLAN UDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 31 Mar 2004
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Apr 2006
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 28 Feb 2007
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008