Udoeyop, Emmanuel Jonathan (CPSO#: 82259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibibio, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 697-4805
Fax: (905) 697-1259
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridgehealth Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 3232
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emmanuel Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82259 )
Dr. V. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82701 )

Business Address:
Suite 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa ON  L1K 0V4
Phone Number: (905) 725-1000

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
3101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-4805


Corporation Name: Victoria Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82259 )
Dr. V. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82701 )

Business Address:
Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa ON  L1K 0V4
Phone Number: (905) 725-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL JONATHAN UDOEYOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOEYOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2005