Udoeyop, Victoria Inimfon (CPSO#: 82701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa ON  L1K 0V4
Phone: (905) 725-1000
Fax: (905) 725-1080
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Emmanuel Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82259 )
Dr. V. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82701 )

Business Address:
3101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 697-4805

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Suite 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa ON  L1K 0V4
Phone Number: (905) 725-1000


Corporation Name: Victoria Udoeyop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82259 )
Dr. V. Udoeyop ( CPSO# 82701 )

Business Address:
Unit 104A
705 Grandview Street North
Oshawa ON  L1K 0V4
Phone Number: (905) 725-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VICTORIA INIMFON UDOEYOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOEYOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2006