Uhm, Jieun (CPSO#: 92294)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chungnam National University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2009 to 10 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2015