Ujaimi, Reem Khaled Abed (CPSO#: 90719)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 2009 to 06 Sep 2009
PEAP - Resident - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2009 to 06 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2010 to 06 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 07 Sep 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2011 to 16 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016