Ulic, Liliana (CPSO#: 71960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West 3
569 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4529 Ext. 2242
Fax: (416) 447-8608
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liliana Ulic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Ulic ( CPSO# 71960 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
West 3, Suite 893
569 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILIANA ULIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1999