Umamaheswaran Kissoon, Meera Annapoorni (CPSO#: 86139)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Names: Umamaheswaran, Meera Annapoorni (used until: 19 Jan 2015 )     Umamaheswaran-Maharaj, Meera Annapoorni (used until: 23 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ajax Health Centre Site
Lakeridge Health
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. A. Umamaheswaran Kissoon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Umamaheswaran Kissoon ( CPSO# 86139 )

Business Address:
Ajax Health Centre Site
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Trinidad and Tobago

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEERA ANNAPOORNI UMAMAHESWARAN KISSOON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UMAMAHESWARAN KISSOON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 05 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 06 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2012