Upenieks, Maria (CPSO#: 55453)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: Ferraro, Maria (used until: 09 Jul 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 621-3253
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Upenieks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Upenieks ( CPSO# 55445 )
Dr. M. Upenieks ( CPSO# 55453 )

Business Address:
Unit 12
250 Wincott Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc 111 St. Regis Cres S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 P- 416-398-0638 F- 416-398-5932 Toll Free- 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 11 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA UPENIEKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPENIEKS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986