Uppal, Gayatri (CPSO#: 78053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjab University India, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint-Vincent Hospital
60,Cambridge street N
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone: 613 5626262 Ext. 2215
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St.Patrick's Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 731 4660
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Perley Rideau Veteran's Health ctr
1750 Russell road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Canada
Phone: (613) 526 7170 Ext. 7400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hillel Lodge,10, Nadolny Sachs Pvt
Ottawa ON  K2A 4G7
Canada
Phone: (613) 728-3900
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gayatri Uppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Uppal ( CPSO# 78053 )

Business Address:
10 Nadolny Sachs Private
Ottawa ON  K2A 4G7

Business Address:
Pearly Rideau Veteran's Health Centre
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Phone Number: (613) 526-7170

Business Address:
St. Patrick's Home
2865 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N5
Phone Number: (613) 731-4660

Business Address:
60 Cambridge Street North
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAYATRI UPPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UPPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 06 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 Feb 2005 to 06 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2006