Urmson, Kristine Irene (CPSO#: 80289)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Stewart, Kristine Irene (used until: 04 Feb 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2003 to 30 Nov 2003
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2009