Urner, Martin Andreas (CPSO#: 110280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zurich, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARTIN ANDREAS URNER may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. URNER is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. URNER shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. URNER is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. URNER shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. URNER ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. URNER ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 31 Aug 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2018