Urson, Shoshana (CPSO#: 73348)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Lithuanian, Russian, Yiddish

Education:The Hebrew University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7417
Fax: (905) 883-2144
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7368 Yonge Street
Suite 205
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-1577
Fax: (905) 707-1152
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Urson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Urson ( CPSO# 73348 )

Business Address:
205 - 7368 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 8H9
Phone Number: (905) 707-1577

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 09 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOSHANA URSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. URSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 26 May 1999 to 25 May 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 26 May 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000