Usmani, Yasmine Ilona (CPSO#: 97181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yasmine Usmani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Usmani ( CPSO# 97181 )

Business Address:
The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3
Phone Number: (905) 816-9822

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASMINE ILONA USMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USMANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2012 to 30 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 25 Nov 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

McMaster University, 16 Dec 2013 to 09 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Mar 2014 to 30 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2014 to 11 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2018