Uthayalingam, Sarangan (CPSO#: 91608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

217 Terrace Hill Street Unit 128
Brantford Ontario
N3R1G8
Brantford ON  N3R 1G8
Canada
Phone: (519) 304-8882
Fax: (519) 304-7880
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Uthayalingam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 13 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARANGAN UTHAYALINGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTHAYALINGAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2017