Utsalo, Vincent Aiyegbeni (CPSO#: 96957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calabar, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12788 Highway 50
Unit 10
Bolton ON  L7E 4G1
Phone: (905) 857-9797
Fax: (905) 857-9791
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Utsalo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Utsalo ( CPSO# 96957 )

Business Address:
10 - 12788 Highway 50
Bolton ON  L7E 4G1
Phone Number: (905) 857-9797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT AIYEGBENI UTSALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UTSALO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2014