Uxa, Amar Krishna (CPSO#: 79818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Bundelkhand University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 4N 508
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4598
Fax: (416) 340-4418
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amar Uxa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Uxa ( CPSO# 79818 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Suite 4N 508
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4598

Business Address:
Suite 8B
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 503
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 1W8
Phone Number: (647) 477-6151

Business Address:
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Business Address:
Suite 8
2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 690-9437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 10 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Sep 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 27 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Amar Krishna Uxa may practise medicine independently in cardiology.