Uy, Paul Gilbert (CPSO#: 95214)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Anishnawbe Health Toronto
22 Vaughan Road
Toronto, Ontario
M6G 2N1
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-657-0379 Ext. 242
Fax: 416-657-3436
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Artists' Health Centre
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street, Toronto, ON
M5T 2S8
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 4166035263
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Uy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Uy ( CPSO# 95214 )

Business Address:
179 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5263

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5263

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL GILBERT UY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2016