Uy, Rhea Mae Locsin (CPSO#: 97646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog, Visayan

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Holland Court
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A7
Phone: (905) 775-8782
Fax: (905) 775-9290
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

52 George Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4V3
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-3242
Fax: (905) 895-5139
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Uy ( CPSO# 97646 )

Business Address:
52 George Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4V3
Phone Number: (905) 853-3242

Business Address:
100 Holland Court
Bradford ON  L3Z 2A7
Phone Number: (905) 775-8782

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHEA MAE LOCSIN UY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014