Gupta, Vikas (CPSO#: 77101)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
and Hematology
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue Room 5-303C
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: (416) 946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vikas Gupta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Gupta ( CPSO# 77101 )

Business Address:
Department of Medical Oncology and Hematology
UHN - Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 5-303C
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Sep 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Vikas Gupta may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Gupta  holds  an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate  Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.  Gupta  no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.