Vachhani, Luv (CPSO#: 92051)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Mississauga CHC
7 - 2555 Dixie Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4C4
Phone: (905) 602-7723
Fax: (905) 602-5432
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Mar 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUV VACHHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VACHHANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2010