Vachhrajani, Shobhan Haresh (CPSO#: 80867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Neurosurgery
Dayton Children's Hospital
1 Children's Plaza
Dayton OH  45404-1815
United States
Phone: 9376413461
Fax: 9376415493

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHOBHAN HARESH VACHHRAJANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VACHHRAJANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Queen's University, 08 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015