Vadera, Rajiv (CPSO#: 60854)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1990

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vadera And Moriarity Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vadera ( CPSO# 60854 )
Dr. T. Moriarity ( CPSO# 59408 )

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Dundas Family Medical Group
Suite 201
133 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V3
Phone Number: (905) 628-6355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJIV VADERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VADERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1990

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 27, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)