Vaidya, Shailla (CPSO#: 73641)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dr. Shailla Vaidya
1466 Bathurst Street
Suite 306
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 536-5555
Fax: (416) 536-3352
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shailla Vaidya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Vaidya ( CPSO# 73641 )

Business Address:
Suite 306
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2S3
Phone Number: (416) 536-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAILLA VAIDYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAIDYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2002