Vail, Gordon Rae (CPSO#: 74949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1030 Oulellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Fax: (519) 252-3632
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon Vail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Vail ( CPSO# 74949 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
Grand Marais Urgent Care Centre
2930 Dominion Boulevard
Windsor ON  N9E 2M8
Phone Number: (226) 773-6259

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON RAE VAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2002