Vakani, Sameer (CPSO#: 93821)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-684-6000
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER VAKANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016