Valcourt, Edith Emmanuelle (CPSO#: 77850)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
Box 1
4289 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 686-1911
Fax: (613) 830-1901
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics & Gynaecology
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Valcourt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Valcourt ( CPSO# 77850 )

Business Address:
2 - 4289 Innes Road
Orleans ON  K1E 0A8
Phone Number: (613) 686-1911

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDITH EMMANUELLE VALCOURT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALCOURT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 14 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2006 to 15 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007