Valdes Salinas, Mario Amilcar (CPSO#: 93006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Universidad De El Salvador, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4370 Ext. 5262
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mario Valdes Salinas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Valdes Salinas ( CPSO# 93006 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Cetnre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIO AMILCAR VALDES SALINAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VALDES SALINAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014