Valdivia, Gonzalo Gabriel (CPSO#: 73301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Apr 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003