Valentino, Pamela (CPSO#: 92744)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:McGill University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2014