Vali, Reza (CPSO#: 97095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Oct 2014

Expiry Date:  14 Oct 2021

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Division of Nuclear Medicine
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 15 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 08 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 09 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 14 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Reza Vali may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging, Division of Nuclear Medicine, University of Toronto, in
                        which Dr. Vali holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Vali  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Vali's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Vali's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 15, 2014.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on October 14, 2021.