Van Alstine, Rebecca Ann (CPSO#: 95369)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Jarvis, Rebecca Ann (used until: 14 Jan 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E8
Phone: 9057494300
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. A. Van Alstine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Van Alstine ( CPSO# 95369 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (905) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANN VAN ALSTINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN ALSTINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015