Van Boekel, Patricia Elisa (CPSO#: 72442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford Rotary Complex
Room 136-353 McCarthy Rd.
Stratford ON  N5A 7S7
Phone: (519) 271-3030
Fax: (519)271-3038
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patricia Elisa Van Boekel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Van Boekel ( CPSO# 72442 )

Business Address:
Stratford Rotary Complex
136 - 353 McCarthy Road
Stratford ON  N5A 7S7
Phone Number: (519) 271-3030

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELISA VAN BOEKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN BOEKEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000