Van Brenk, Bert (CPSO#: 66818)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Medical Centre
P O Box 4200
707 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone: (705) 876-4521
Fax: (705) 743-1449
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Van Brenk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Brenk ( CPSO# 66818 )

Business Address:
The Medical Centre
707 Charlotte Street
PO Box 4200
Peterborough ON  K9J 7B3
Phone Number: (705) 876-4521

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Hospital
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERT VAN BRENK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN BRENK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1998