Van Der Loo, Sara Ellinor (CPSO#: 77872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Marks Street
P O Box 1450
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone: (807) 597-2721
Fax: (807) 597-4632
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Van Der Loo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van Der Loo ( CPSO# 77872 )

Business Address:
123 Marks Street
PO Box 1450
Atikokan ON  P0T 1C0
Phone Number: (807) 597-2721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA ELLINOR VAN DER LOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN DER LOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 10 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2005