Van Dorsser, John Gerard (CPSO#: 23727)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 40013, Charlotte P.O., Peterborough ON K9J 8R9
Date Received: 11 Mar 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 30 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Mar 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 30 May 2012
Summary:

On May 30, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Gerard van Dorsser committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession. Dr. van Dorsser admitted the allegation. 
 
Dr. van Dorsser is a general practitioner with a practice in Peterborough, Ontario. The following 
deficiencies were identified in Dr. van Dorsser's care of patients: 
 
Dr. van Dorsser failed to appropriately manage chronic, non-malignant pain by: 
      a)    prescribing the short-acting narcotic Demerol over a sustained period of time to 
            Patient A; 
      b)    prescribing the short-acting narcotic Demerol, both orally and by injection, for 
            several years to Patient B; 
      c)    prescribing large doses and quantities of narcotics to Patient C, who was known to 
            have a substance abuse disorder and to be at significant risk of overdose because 
            of co-morbidities; and 
      d)    prescribing narcotic medication to Patient D even though he was known to have a 
            substance abuse disorder.  
 
Therefore, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. van Dorsser's 
      Certificate of Registration: 
      (a)   Dr. van Dorsser shall not prescribe any drug that is: 
 
            (i)   Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
            (ii)  Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under 
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); or 
            (iii) Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and 
                  Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27). 
 
      (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of 
      Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached [to the Order] at Schedule "A"; and the 
      current regulatory lists are attached [to the Order] at Schedule "B"); 
 
      (b)   Dr. van Dorsser shall post a sign that is clearly visible upon entering his office(s) 
            in the form set out at Schedule "C" [to the Order].  For further clarity, this sign 
            shall state as follows: "Dr. van Dorsser is prohibited from prescribing Narcotic 
            Drugs, Narcotic Preparations and Controlled Drugs."; and 
      (c)   Dr. van Dorsser shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and 
            patient charts and such other steps as the College may take for the purpose of 
            monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order. 
 
2.    Dr. van Dorsser pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00 within ninety (90) 
      days from the date of this Order. 
 
3.    Dr. van Dorsser appear before it to be reprimanded. 
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 30, 2012