Van, Hoa Ngoc Tuan (CPSO#: 90803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
#1-180 McNaughton Ave West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 354-6440
Fax: (519) 397-3061
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H Van Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Van ( CPSO# 90803 )

Business Address:
CK Cardiac Imaging Centre
180 McNaughton Avenue West
Suite 1
Chatham ON  N7L 4Z7


Corporation Name: Dhssraj Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Singh ( CPSO# 108015)
Dr. H. Van ( CPSO# 90803 )

Business Address:
1 - 180 McNaughton Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 354-6440

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Business Address:
Windsor Heart Institute
Suite 201
2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 27 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOA NGOC TUAN VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014