Van Jaarsveld, Barend Petrus (CPSO#: 85855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chelsea Court Health Centre
779 Chelsea Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6J8
Phone: (613) 342-1199
Fax: (613) 342-2900
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Van Jaarsveld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Jaarsveld ( CPSO# 85855 )

Business Address:
Chelsea Court Health Centre
779 Chlesea Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6J8
Phone Number: (613) 342-1199

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BAREND PETRUS VAN JAARSVELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN JAARSVELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2009