Van Lierop, Muriel Joan (CPSO#: 22994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1975

Summary

Former Name: Van-Lierop, Muriel Joan (used until: 22 Jul 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1246 Yonge Street
Suite 205
TORONTO ON
M4T 1W5
Toronto ON  M4T 1W5
Phone: (416) 229-1993
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muriel J. Van Lierop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Lierop ( CPSO# 22994 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1246 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 1W5
Phone Number: (416) 229-1993

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURIEL JOAN VAN LIEROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN LIEROP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1975