Van, Ngoc Binh (CPSO#: 93752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Hesperler
20B
Cambridge ON  N1R 8H2
Phone: (519) 267-2588
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

580 Lancaster St. W
Kitchener ON  N2K 1M3
Canada
Phone: (519) 896-6699
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

525 Saginaw Pkwy
Cambridge ON  N1T 0C3
Canada
Phone: 5196212225
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

51 Benton St
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Canada
Phone: 2262403014
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ngoc Binh Van Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Van ( CPSO# 93752 )

Business Address:
20B - 600 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 8H2
Phone Number: (519) 267-2940

Business Address:
580 Lancaster Street West
Kitchener ON  N2K 1M3
Phone Number: (519) 896-6699

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Feb 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NGOC BINH VAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 May 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2015