Van Stralen, Judy Petra Maria (CPSO#: 73619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone: (613) 726-7355
Fax: (613) 726-7567
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JPM Van Stralen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Van Stralen ( CPSO# 73619 )

Business Address:
206 - 1637 Woodroffe Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2G 1W2
Phone Number: (613) 726-7355

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDY PETRA MARIA VAN STRALEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN STRALEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003