Van Uum, Stanislaus Hendrikus Maria (CPSO#: 80180)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 25 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Nijmegen, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Care London
Div of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room B5-130
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6170
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stanislaus Van Uum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Van Uum ( CPSO# 80180 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care London
Div of Endocrinology & Metabolism
Room B5-130
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6170

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Netherlands

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANISLAUS HENDRIKUS MARIA VAN UUM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO in which Dr. VAN UUM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. VAN UUM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. VAN UUM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. VAN UUM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. VAN UUM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011